24.10.2014 |
Refusal of application |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
12.09.2014 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
30.04.2014 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
04.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.04.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
25.07.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
25.07.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
22.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.05.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.02.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.12.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2010 |
First examination report |
|
28.09.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
16.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
30.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|