EP2217212 - PHARMACEUTICAL SOLID HYBRIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmaceutics International, Inc. 10819 Gilroy Road Hunt Valley MD 21030 / US | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSAN, Emadeldin 1028 Breezewick Rd. Towson MD 21286 / US | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Verhorevoort, Kerry Linda Bridle Intellectual Property Limited 6F Thomas Way Lakesview Business Park Canterbury CT3 4JZ / GB | [2010/33] | Application number, filing date | 08838890.5 | 16.10.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008US80105 | Priority number, date | US20070874708 | 18.10.2007 Original published format: US 874708 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009052251 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2217212 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K31/192 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/1611 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FESTE HYBRIDEN | [2010/33] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL SOLID HYBRIDS | [2010/33] | French: | HYBRIDES PHARMACEUTIQUES SOLIDES | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/48] | 05.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.09.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/48] | Appeal following examination | 06.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T0981/14 | 08.09.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007092784 (PHARMACEUTICS INTERNATIONAL IN [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * examples 1-4 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] *; | [X]WO2006100281 (LOSAN PHARMA GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-25 * examples 1-17 * * page 1, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP0438249 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE]) [X] 1-25 * examples 1,2,8 *; | [X]WO2006096580 (BANNER PHARMACAPS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * examples 1-12 * * page 3, line 12 - line 21 *; | [X]WO0004879 (ANDRIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * example 1 *; | [X]WO9908500 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 2 * | Examination | GB2423710 |