EP2214360 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD AND RADIO BASE STATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/31] | MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD AND RADIO BASE STATION | ||
[2015/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2016/26] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAPSARI, Wuri Andarmawanti@c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
MOTEGI, Masayuki@c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Yasuhiro@c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
SHIMAZU, Yoshitsugu@c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
NAKAMURA, Takehiro@c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/46] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
HAPSARI, Wuri Andamawanti c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
MOTEGI, Masayuki c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
KATO, Yasuhiro c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIMAZU, Yoshitsugu c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAMURA, Takehiro c/o NTT DoCoMo Inc., Int.Prop.Dept. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/26] |
Former [2010/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08845241.2 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008JP69734 | Priority number, date | JP20070282380 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007282380 | [2010/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009057684 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2214360 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2214360 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W40/36, // H04W36/02 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H04W40/36 (EP,US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,US);
H04W36/023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/34] | H04W36/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/31] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND FUNKBASISSTATIONEN | [2015/34] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD AND RADIO BASE STATIONS | [2015/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE ET STATIONS DE BASE RADIO | [2015/34] |
Former [2010/31] | MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND FUNKBASISSTATION | ||
Former [2010/31] | MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD AND RADIO BASE STATION | ||
Former [2010/31] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE ET STATION DE BASE RADIO | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2010 | Translation filed | 20.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 28.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2008 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | IE | 30.10.2016 | LU | 30.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
TR | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
IE | 30.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 30.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2007007990 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | by applicant | JP2007282380 |