EP2212547 - IMPULSE HYDROELECTRIC TURBINE COMPRISING ROTATING NOZZLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frangié, Nabil H. 1230 Villeray Apt. 11 Montreal, Quebec H2R 1J7 / CA | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | L'Helgoualch, Jean, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | L'Helgoualch, Jean, et al Ipsilon Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | ||
Former [2010/31] | L'Helgoualch, Jean, et al Cabinet Sueur et L'Helgoualch Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 08847392.1 | 31.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008CA01897 | Priority number, date | CA20072604610 | 05.11.2007 Original published format: CA 2604610 | [2010/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009059398 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2212547 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212547 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/00, F01D15/10, F01D15/12, F03B17/02 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
F03B1/04 (EP,US);
F01D1/32 (EP,US);
F03B17/02 (EP,US);
Y02E10/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | F03B13/00, F01D15/10, F01D15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HYDROELEKTRISCHE ANTRIEBSTURBINE MIT ROTATIONSDÜSEN | [2010/31] | English: | IMPULSE HYDROELECTRIC TURBINE COMPRISING ROTATING NOZZLES | [2010/31] | French: | TURBINE HYDROÉLECTRIQUE À IMPULSION COMPRENANT DES BUSES ROTATIVES | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 28.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2008 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MT | 09.12.2015 | NL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 31.10.2008 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 31.10.2008 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.10.2008 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US171256 (BACKUS) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5263814 (JANG YOUNG-WAN [KR]) [A] 1-5 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]JPS5634977 (FUKAI KIYOTATSU) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US5263814 (JANG YOUNG-WAN [KR]); | [A]US3926534 (ERICKSON JOHN W); | [A]US2060414 (ALBERT FLADELAND) |