17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
14.10.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
19.08.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
27.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
06.11.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
28.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.10.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.10.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] |
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
02.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
15.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|