Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8444374 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2010237622 | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA01897 | 31.10.2008 | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5425796B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B2 | JP2011502228 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA01897 | 31.10.2008 | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2212547 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2015 | B1 | EP2212547 | 05.11.2014 | A4 | EP2212547 | 04.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA01897 | 31.10.2008 | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2562776T | 08.03.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA01897 | 31.10.2008 | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2212547T | 30.06.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA01897 | 31.10.2008 | EP08847392 | 31.10.2008 | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009059398 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2604610 | 31.03.2015 | C | CA2604610 | 05.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2604610 | 05.11.2007 |