|
16.03.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
08.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
26 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
22 |