Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2209851 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | B1 | EP2209851 | 28.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08849616 | 13.11.2008 | WO2008EP65450 | 13.11.2008 | EP07022281 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009062996 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07022281 | 16.11.2007 |