EP2222595 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A PURIFIED SYNTHESIS GAS STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMIT, Cornelis Jacobus Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
ZANDER, Jan Volkert Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 08852205.7 | 19.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008EP65794 | Priority number, date | EP20070121140 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07121140 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009065841 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222595 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2222595 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/36, C01B3/52, C10J3/82 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
C01B3/36 (EP,US);
C01B3/52 (EP,US);
C10J3/485 (EP,US);
C10J3/84 (EP,US);
C10J3/845 (EP,US);
C10K1/004 (EP,US);
C10K1/005 (EP,US);
C10K1/101 (EP,US);
C10K1/14 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0255 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0415 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0485 (EP,US);
C01B2203/148 (EP,US);
C10J2200/09 (EP,US);
C10J2200/152 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0916 (EP,US);
C10J2300/093 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1618 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1634 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1659 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1665 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1807 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1846 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEREINIGTEN SYNTHESEGASSTROMS | [2010/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A PURIFIED SYNTHESIS GAS STREAM | [2010/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COURANT DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE PURIFIÉ | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 09.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2011 | BE | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | HR | 06.07.2011 | HU | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | NO | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | ES | 17.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | IE | 19.11.2011 | LU | 19.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 19.11.2011 | ||
LU | 19.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 19.11.2011 | ||
LU | 19.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 19.11.2011 | ||
LU | 19.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 19.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 19.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
IE | 19.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4430316 (RANKE GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 6 - column 8, line 31 *; | [A]US4515604 (EISENLOHR KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [DA] - J.Y.MAK ET AL., "Synthesis gas purification in gasification to ammonia/urea complex", GASIFICATION.ORG, (2004), URL: http://gasification.org/Docs/2004_Papers/26KUBE_Paper.pdf, (20080516), XP002480509 [DA] 1 * figure 6 * | [A] - U. KOSS ET AL., "Lurgi's MPG gasification plus Rectisol gas purification", GASIFICATION.ORG, (2005), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.gasification.org/Docs/2005_Papers/41SCHL%20Paper.pdf, (20080516), XP002480508 [A] 1 * page 4 * * page 7 - page 12 * |