EP2163180 - Vacuum cleaner, in particular floor vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertram, Andre Berkensiek 24 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Gerhards, Manfred Franz-Sester-Strassse 61 53879 Euskirchen / DE | 03 /
Gerth, Volker Vilsendorfer Strasse 30a 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
Liebig, Oliver Am Poggenbrink 49 33611 Bielefeld / DE | 05 /
Schultz, Rainer Zum Kiwitt 17 33335 Gütersloh / DE | 06 /
Stork, Heiko Dickenheide 41 32051 Herford / DE | 07 /
Wegener, Dirk Traberweg 26 33649 Bielefeld / DE | [2010/11] | Application number, filing date | 09014721.6 | 13.12.2006 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | DE20051061040 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061040 | DE20061058613 | 11.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006058613 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163180 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2163180 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/28 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
A47L9/2889 (EP,US);
A47L9/00 (EP,US);
A47L9/2842 (EP,US);
A47L9/2857 (EP,US);
A47L9/2878 (EP,US);
A47L9/2884 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | Staubsauger, insbesondere Bodenstaubsauger | [2010/11] | English: | Vacuum cleaner, in particular floor vacuum cleaner | [2010/11] | French: | Aspirateur, notamment aspirateur de sol | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06829557.5 / EP1962661 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060829557) is 29.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4835409 (BHAGWAT PRADEEP M [US], et al) [X] 9 * column 6, lines 38-43; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2002121000 (TYLER ALEXANDER MARTIN [US]) [X] 9 * the whole document *; | [XI]US6448732 (BLOCK THOMAS S [US]) [X] 9,11 * column 3, line 19 - column 6, line 24; figure - * [I] 12; | [X]JP2001321310 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 9-12 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004032696 (POLAR LIGHT LTD [CN], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraphs [0070] - [0072] - [0 81] - [0091]; figure - *; | [A]EP0401531 (NAT UNION ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE102004018793 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0038] - [0048]; figure - *; | [AP]DE102005063240 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [AP] 1 * paragraphs [0017] - [0025]; figure - *; | [A]US5596236 (LEE JIN-BANG [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 38 - column 8, line 32; figures 10-20 * * column 11, line 18 - column 13, line 46; figures 26-32 * |