Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2078840 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | B1 | EP2078840 | 15.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0850150 | 11.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE535695T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0850150 | 11.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2373264T | 01.02.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0850150 | 11.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2926331 | 20.07.2012 | B1 | FR2926331 | 17.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0850150 | 11.01.2008 |