EP2078840 - Strategy for implementing a quick-heating process of a catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerin, Stéphane 25 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | 02 /
Folliot, Pascal 26 allée des Genêts 78280 Guyancourt / FR | 03 /
Singer, Arnold 12 rue Pierre Lhomme 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Ménès, Catherine PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Ménès, Catherine Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/29] | Ménès, Catherine Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 09150076.9 | 06.01.2009 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | FR20080050150 | 11.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850150 | [2009/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078840 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078840 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F01N11/00 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
F02D41/0255 (EP);
F01N11/005 (EP);
F01N13/0097 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP);
F01N3/103 (EP);
F01N3/106 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Strategiezur Umsetzung eines Schnellerhitzungsprozesses eines Katalysators | [2009/29] | English: | Strategy for implementing a quick-heating process of a catalyst | [2009/29] | French: | Strategie de mise en oeuvre d'un processus de chauffage rapide d'un catalyseur | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2009 | AT | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | HR | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MK | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | PL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | LU | 06.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 29.02.2012 | NO | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LU | 06.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MK | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
PL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5261230 (YUUKI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 8 - line 26; figures 3,5,6 * * column 5, line 4 - line 15 * * column 5, line 39 - line 65 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 20 * * column 14, line 42 - line 64 *; | [A]US5390491 (SUZUMURA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 16 - column 11, line 47; figure 11 *; | [A]JPH09228824 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]DE10162115 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0028] , [0029] *; | [X]DE10210550 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * |