|
08.02.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |