EP2090642 - Engine lubrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bera, Tushar Kanti c/o Infineum USA L.P. 1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710, Building 1 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 02 /
Emert, Jacob c/o Infineum USA L.P. 1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710, Building 1 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 03 /
Rincon-Barbado, Alvaro C/Esgueva N2 2A 09400 Aranda de Duero / ES | 04 /
Dodd, James Christian c/o Infineum UK Ltd. PO Box 1, Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | 05 /
Spencer, Jeremy Roger c/o Infineum UK Ltd. PO Box 1, Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Pauline Therese, et al Infineum UK Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Lewis, Pauline Therese, et al Infineum UK Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | Lewis, Pauline Therese, et al Infineum UK Limited, P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 09151448.9 | 27.01.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | US20080028021 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: US 28021 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090642 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090642 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/06, C10M141/10, C10M161/00 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C10M141/06 (EP,US);
C10M141/10 (EP,US);
C10M161/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2207/04 (EP,US);
C10M2207/046 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2207/28 (EP,US);
C10M2207/288 (EP,US);
C10M2209/101 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/086 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/262, C10N2010/04 (US,EP);
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2009/34] | C10M129/95, C10M141/02, C10M141/06, C10M141/10, C10M145/20, C10M145/24, C10M161/00, // C10N10/04, C10N30/04, C10N40/25 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Motorschmierung | [2009/34] | English: | Engine lubrication | [2009/34] | French: | Lubrification de moteur | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2009 | AT | 04.04.2012 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | HR | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | MK | 04.04.2012 | MT | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | NO | 04.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | |
NO | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9213933 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 13 - page 16 ** claims 1,8-14,17,18 *; | [X]WO9600766 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US], et al) [X] 10-12 * abstract * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 15 * * page 11, lines 16-19 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 10 * * page 15, lines 4-7 * * page 13, line 35 - page 14, line 4 *; | [A]EP1528099 (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 9; table 1 *; | [A]DE10356436 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * claims 6,8,10 *; | [X]EP1693434 (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9 * claim 10 * * claims 2-5 * * page 5, paragraph 26 * * page 11, paragraph 63 * * claim 13 * * page 16, paragraph 105 *; | [PX]US2008039349 (DODD JAMES C [GB], et al) [PX] 1-11 * claims 1-19 *; | [A] - ABBOTT F P ET AL, "EVALUATION OF MARINE DIESEL ENGINE OIL WATER SEPARATION PROCEDURES", SPRING TECHNICAL CONFERENCE OF THE ASME INTERNAL COMBUSTIONENGINE DIVISION, XX, XX, (19000101), vol. 11, pages 39 - 50, XP009040948 [A] 1-12 * page 40; table 2 * * abstract * | Examination | US2008039537 | - WU J ET AL, "Effect of Demulsifier Properties on Destabilization of Water-in-Oil Emulsion", ENERGY & FUELS, THE SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/EF030113E, (20031015), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0887-0624, pages 1554 - 1559, XP007912900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ef030113e | by applicant | US3087936 | US3172892 | GB989409 | US3185704 | US3215707 | US3231587 | US3254025 | US3272746 | US3275554 | US3381022 | US3442808 | US3565804 | US3632511 | US3912764 | GB1440219 | US4102798 | US4110349 | US4113639 | US4116876 | US4234435 | US4579675 | US4612132 | EP0208560 | US4663064 | US4686054 | US4839071 | US4839072 | US4857217 | US4952739 | US4956107 | US4963275 | US5026495 | US5053152 | US5085788 | US5229022 | US5259906 | US5328622 | US5334321 | US5356552 | US5407591 | US5498809 | US5663130 | US5705577 | US5716912 | US5814715 | US5849676 | US5861363 | US6022929 | US6030930 | US2006189492 |