Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2128475 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2010 | B1 | EP2128475 | 02.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20080107 | 22.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE482347T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20080107 | 22.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602009000223D1 | 04.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20080107 | 22.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2353472T | 02.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20080107 | 22.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITBS20080107 | 23.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBS20080107 | 22.05.2008 |