EP2128475 - Caliper for a disc brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freni Brembo S.p.A. Via Brembo, 25 24035 Curno (Bergamo) / IT | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gotti, Antonio Via Puccini, 214 24030, Almenno San Bartolomeo BERGAMO / IT | 02 /
Pagni, Marco C.na Misana, 51 20065, Inzago MILANO / IT | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Mitola, Marco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza Mario Saggin, 2 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Mitola, Marco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet 9 35131 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 09153727.4 | 26.02.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | IT2008BS00107 | 22.05.2008 Original published format: IT BS20080107 | [2009/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128475 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128475 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/095, // F16D55/228 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
F16D65/095 (EP);
F16D55/228 (EP);
F16D2055/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Sattel für eine Scheibenbremse | [2009/49] | English: | Caliper for a disc brake | [2009/49] | French: | Étrier pour frein à disque | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 03.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2010 | BE | 22.09.2010 | CY | 22.09.2010 | CZ | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | HR | 22.09.2010 | HU | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | MK | 22.09.2010 | MT | 22.09.2010 | NL | 22.09.2010 | PL | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | SK | 22.09.2010 | TR | 22.09.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | NO | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | IE | 26.02.2011 | LU | 26.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
TR | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3882972 (NEWSTEAD CHARLES, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 1; figure 2 *; | [A]US4392559 (OSHIMA HARUMI [JP]) [A] 1* column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 11; figure 8 *; | [A]US6260670 (MAEHARA TOSHIFUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2005121174 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [A] 1 * abstract * |