17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
04.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
12.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
24.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
21.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.08.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
03.06.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
01.04.2011 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
30.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
03.02.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|