Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8619959 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2013 | B2 | US2012300914 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39307709 | 26.02.2009 | US201213571123 | 09.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8265247 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2012 | B2 | US2010215161 | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39307709 | 26.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101820464B | Global Dossier | 09.10.2013 | B | CN101820464 | 01.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US39307709 | 26.02.2009 | EP09153806 | 26.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2224712 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B1 | EP2224712 | 01.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153806 | 26.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE551824T | 15.04.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153806 | 26.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2694756 | 29.01.2013 | C | CA2694756 | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153806 | 26.02.2009 |