EP2113688 - Pressurised fluid supply for a pressurised fluid torque oscillation attenuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dögel, Thomas Ludwigstrasse 23 97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | 02 /
Busold, Thomas Fuldaer Weg 8 36039 Fulda / DE | [2009/45] | Application number, filing date | 09158317.9 | 21.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | DE20081001495 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008001495 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113688 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/00, F16F15/16, // F16H61/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
F16H57/0006 (EP);
F16F15/16 (EP);
F16H61/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Druckfluidversorgung für eine Druckfluid-Torsionsschwingungsdämpferanordnung | [2009/45] | English: | Pressurised fluid supply for a pressurised fluid torque oscillation attenuator | [2009/45] | French: | Alimentation en fluide de pression pour un agencement d'amortisseur d'oscillations de torsion d'un liquide sous pression | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/45] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0240886 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 35, line 2 - line 21 * * page 53, line 28 - line 29 * * figures 9,14,15,18 *; | [A]DE102005058531 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0047] * * figure 8 *; | [T]EP2083192 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [T] * figure 2 * |