Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2139272

EP2139272 - Method and system for attaching a mobile equipment to a wireless communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 01.07.2015  [2015/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SISVEL International S.A.
44, rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
[2014/18]
Former [2012/38]For all designated states
SISVEL International S.A.
44, rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2012/36]For all designated states
Sisvel international S.A.
44, rue de la Vallée
2661 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust
Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company
National Association
919 North Market Street, Suite 1600
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Hurtta, Tuija
Kiskottajankuja 4 D 49
02660, Espoo / FI
 [2014/18]
Former [2010/01]01 / Hurtta, Tuija
Kiskottajankuja 4 D 49
02660, Espoo / FI
Representative(s)Baroni, Matteo , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l.
Foro Buonaparte, 51
20121 Milano / IT
[2013/24]
Former [2010/07]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/01]Rossel, Markus
TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09166847.513.10.2000
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2139272
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2139272
Date:30.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/04, H04W88/16, H04W92/24
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2010/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Verbindung eines mobilen Geräts mit einem drahtlosen Kommunikationsnetzwerk[2010/01]
English:Method and system for attaching a mobile equipment to a wireless communication network[2010/01]
French:Procédé et système pour attacher un équipement mobile à un réseau de communication sans fil[2010/01]
Examination procedure23.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/13]
30.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2013
27.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.03.2014Fee for grant paid
18.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00967868.1  / EP1334634
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000967868) is  16.08.2007
Opposition(s)02.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
04.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
22.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
[2015/27]
Former [2014/47]CY30.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6104929  (JOSSE THIERRY [SE], et al) [X] 1,6,11,16 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 53 * * column 7, line 15 - column 11, line 30; figures 3, 3A * [Y] 2-5,7-10,12-15,17-20;
 [Y]DE19742681  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 2-5,7-10,12-15,17-20 * abstract * * page 12, line 20 - page 3, line 22; figure 11 *;
 [A]WO0021319  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,6,10,16 * abstract * * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 25; figure 3 *
by applicantUS6104929
 DE19742681
 WO0021319