Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010298125 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090044041 | 20.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101038750B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2011 | B1 | KR20100125041 | 30.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090044041 | 20.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5328583B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | B2 | JP2010269302 | 02.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090044041 | 20.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2260939 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | B1 | EP2260939 | 15.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090044041 | 20.05.2009 |