EP2260939 - Carbon nanotube catalysts having metal catalyst nano-particles supported on the inner channel of the carbon nanotubes only and preparation method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/50] | Carbon nanotube catalysts having metal catalyst nano-particles supported on inner channel of carbon nanotube and preparation method thereof | ||
[2019/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 102 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | [2020/22] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 102 Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu 305-343 Daejeon / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hee Yeon 305-201 Central Park Apt., Munhwa 1-dong, Jung-gu Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Nam Jo 110-903, Dream World Apt. Jangdae-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | [2020/22] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Kim, Hee Yeon 305-201 Central Park Apt., Munhwa 1-dong, Jung-gu Daejeon / KR | ||
02 /
Jeong, Nam Jo 110-903, Dream World Apt. Jangdae-dong, Yuseong-g Daejeon / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/50] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09170707.5 | 18.09.2009 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | KR20090044041 | 20.05.2009 Original published format: KR 20090044041 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2260939 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2260939 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/28, B01J23/42, B01J23/46, B01J23/75, B01J23/755, B01J37/06, B01J37/34, B01J21/18, B01J37/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
B01J21/185 (EP,US);
B01J37/02 (KR);
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/06 (EP,US);
B01J37/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kohlenstoffnanorohr-Katalysatoren mit Metallkatalysator-Nanopartikeln, die nur im inneren Kanal des Kohlenstoffnanorohrs gestützt werden und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2019/48] | English: | Carbon nanotube catalysts having metal catalyst nano-particles supported on the inner channel of the carbon nanotubes only and preparation method thereof | [2019/48] | French: | Catalyseurs en nanotubes de carbone dotés de nanoparticules de catalyseur métalliques situées uniquement dans le canal interne du nanotube de carbone et leur procédé de préparation | [2019/48] |
Former [2010/50] | Kohlenstoffnanorohr-Katalysatoren mit Metallkatalysator-Nanopartikeln, die an einem inneren Kanal des Kohlenstoffnanorohrs gestützt werden und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/50] | Carbon nanotube catalysts having metal catalyst nano-particles supported on inner channel of carbon nanotube and preparation method thereof | ||
Former [2010/50] | Catalyseurs en nanotubes de carbone dotés de nanoparticules de catalyseur métalliques situées dans un canal interne du nanotube de carbone et leur procédé de préparation | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IE | 18.09.2020 | LU | 18.09.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IE | 18.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IE | 18.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IE | 18.09.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 27.05.2020 | |
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007149109 (SELDON TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 9-15 * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0215] * [I] 1-8; | [XI]EP1964812 (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]) [X] 9-15 * figure - * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052]; figure - *[I] 1-8; | [XI]EP2037517 (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]) [X] 9-15 * figure - * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figure - * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * [I] 1-8; | [XPI]EP2077151 (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]) [XP] 9-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036]; figure - * [I] 1-8 |