Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2180344
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.09.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
04.07.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
31.05.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.12.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2015 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
11.06.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.11.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
04.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
04.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |