Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8238196 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2012 | B2 | US2010097889 | 22.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25568508 | 22.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2180344 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2011 | A3 | EP2180344 | 28.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25568508 | 22.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2683243 | 22.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25568508 | 22.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101726753B | 13.08.2014 | B | CN101726753 | 09.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US25568508 | 22.10.2008 |