EP2180344 - A sensor module having multiple parts for use in a wireless survey data acquisition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geco Technology B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ S'Gravenhage / NL | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golparian, Daniel H. Bjerregaardsgt 24 N-0172, Oslo / NO | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk LLP Oxford Business Park South Oxford, Oxfordshire, OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09173756.9 | 22.10.2009 | [2010/17] | Priority number, date | US20080255685 | 22.10.2008 Original published format: US 255685 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2180344 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2180344 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/22, G01V11/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
G01V1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sensormodul mit mehreren Teilen zur Verwendung in einem drahtlosen Umfrage-Datenerfassungssystem | [2010/17] | English: | A sensor module having multiple parts for use in a wireless survey data acquisition system | [2010/17] | French: | Module de capteur doté de plusieurs pièces à utiliser dans un système d'acquisition de données d'étude sans fil | [2010/17] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 07.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008062815 (ISELI JAMES W [US]) [X] 1-4,7-11 * paragraphs [0039] , [0043] , [0046] , [0049] , [0050] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072]; claim 1 * [I] 5,6,12,13; | [A]WO03054583 (GLOBAL E BANG INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2A,4; claim 1 *; | [A]US2007286022 (BULL ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US5801632 (OPAL ANTHONY P [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 7, line 26 - column 7, line 57 *; | [A]WO2007102668 (PARK TAE SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |