EP2168984 - Human antibodies that bind human IL-12 and methods for producing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co KG Max-Planck-Ring 2a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salfeld, Jochen 177 Old Westborogh Road North Gafton, MA 01536 / US | 02 /
Roguska, Michael 16 Hilldale Road Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 03 /
Paskind, Michael 253 Redemption Rock Trail Sterling, MA 01564 / US | 04 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 05 /
Tracey, Daniel E. 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 06 /
White, Michael 30 Angelica Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 07 /
Kaymakcalan, Zehra 4 Picadilly Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 08 /
Labkovsky, Boris 107A-5 Broadmeadow Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 09 /
Sakorafas, Paul 25 Old Winchester Street Newton Highlands, MA 02461 / US | 10 /
Friedrich, Stuart 20 Albion Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 11 /
Myles, Angela 118 South Road Pepperell, MA 01463 / US | 12 /
Veldman, Geertruida M. 60 Woodmere Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 13 /
Venturini, Amy 3901 Cathedral Bell Road Raleigh, NC 27614 / US | 14 /
Warne, Nicholas W. 27 Farrwood Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 15 /
Widom, Angela 19 Cherokee Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 16 /
Elvin, John G. 36 Perowne Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2AY / GB | 17 /
Duncan, Alexander R. 3 Hauwxton Road Little Shelford Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 5HJ / GB | 18 /
Derbyshire, Elaine J. 14 Towers Drive Crowthorne Berks Berkshire RG45 7LR / GB | 19 /
Carmen, Sara 136 Sturton Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2QF / GB | 20 /
Smith, Stephen 33 Church Road Wicken Ely Cambridgeshire CB7 5XT / GB | 21 /
Holtet, Thor Las Strandvejen 4 8410 Rønde / DK | 22 /
Du Fou, Sarah L. 76 Ickleford Road Hitchen Hertfordshire SG5 1TL / GB | [2012/30] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
Salfeld, Jochen 177 Old Westborogh Road North Gafton, MA 01536 / US | ||
02 /
Roguska, Michael 16 Hilldale Road Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
03 /
Paskind, Michael 253 Redemption Rock Trail Sterling, MA 01564 / US | |||
04 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
05 /
Tracey, Daniel E. 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | |||
06 /
White, Michael 30 Angelica Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | |||
07 /
Kaymakcalan, Zehra 4 Picadilly Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | |||
08 /
Labkovsky, Boris 107A-5 Broadmeadow Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | |||
09 /
Sakorafas, Paul 25 Old Winchester Street Newton Highlands, Massachusetts 02461 / US | |||
10 /
Friedrich, Stuart 20 Albion Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
11 /
Myles, Angela 118 South Road Pepperell, Massachusetts 01463 / US | |||
12 /
Veldman, Geertruida M. 60 Woodmere Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | |||
13 /
Venturini, Amy 3901 Cathedral Bell Road Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | |||
14 /
Warne, Nicholas W. 27 Farrwood Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
15 /
Widom, Angela 19 Cherokee Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
16 /
Elvin, John G. 36 Perowne Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2AY / GB | |||
17 /
Duncan, Alexander R. 3 Hauwxton Road Little Shelford Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 5HJ / GB | |||
18 /
Derbyshire, Elaine J. 14 Towers Drive Crowthorne Berks Berkshire RG45 7LR / GB | |||
19 /
Carmen, Sara 136 Sturton Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2QF / GB | |||
20 /
Smith, Stephen 33 Church Road Wicken Ely Cambridgeshire CB7 5XT / GB | |||
21 /
Holtet, Thor Las Strandvejen 4 8410 Rønde / DK | |||
22 /
Du Fou, Sarah L. 76 Ickleford Road Hitchen Hertfordshire SG5 1TL / GB | |||
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
Salfeld, Jochen 177 Old Westborogh Road North Gafton, MA 01536 / US | ||
02 /
Roguska, Michael 16 Hilldale Road Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
03 /
Paskind, Michael 253 Redemption Rock Trail Sterling, MA 01564 / US | |||
04 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
05 /
Tracey, Daniel E. 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | |||
06 /
White, Michael 30 Angelica Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | |||
07 /
Kaymakcalan, Zehra 4 Picadilly Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | |||
08 /
Labkovsky, Boris 107A-5 Broadmeadow Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | |||
09 /
Sakorafas, Paul 47 Court Street Newton, MA 02160 / US | |||
10 /
Friedrich, Stuart 20 Albion Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
11 /
Myles, Angela Apartment No. 7 11 Crescent Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
12 /
Veldman, Geertruida M. 60 Woodmere Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | |||
13 /
Venturini, Amy 207 Woburn Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
14 /
Warne, Nicholas W. 27 Farrwood Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
15 /
Widom, Angela 19 Cherokee Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
16 /
Elvin, John G. 36 Perowne Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2AY / GB | |||
17 /
Duncan, Alexander R. 3 Hauwxton Road Little Shelford Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 5HJ / GB | |||
18 /
Derbyshire, Elaine J. 14 Towers Drive Crowthorne Berks Berkshire RG45 7LR / GB | |||
19 /
Carmen, Sara 136 Sturton Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2QF / GB | |||
20 /
Smith, Stephen 33 Church Road Wicken Ely Cambridgeshire CB7 5XT / GB | |||
21 /
Holtet, Thor Las Strandvejen 4 8410 Rønde / DK | |||
22 /
Du Fou, Sarah L. 76 Ickleford Road Hitchen Hertfordshire SG5 1TL / GB | |||
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Salfeld, Jochen 177 Old Westborogh Road North Gafton, MA 01536 / US | ||
02 /
Roguska, Michael 16 Hilldale Road Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
03 /
Paskind, Michael 253 Redemption Rock Trail Sterling, MA 01564 / US | |||
04 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
05 /
Tracey, Daniel E. 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | |||
06 /
White, Michael 30 Angelica Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | |||
07 /
Kaymakcalan, Zehra 4 Picadilly Way Westborough, MA 01581 / US | |||
08 /
Labkovsky, Boris 107A-5 Broadmeadow Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | |||
09 /
Sakorafas, Paul 47 Court Street Newton, MA 02160 / US | |||
10 /
Friedrich, Stuart 20 Albion Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
11 /
Myles, Angela Apartment No. 7 11 Crescent Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
12 /
Veldman, Geertruida M. 60 Woodmere Drive Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | |||
13 /
Venturini, Amy 207 Woburn Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
14 /
Warne, Nicholas W. 27 Farrwood Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | |||
15 /
Widom, Angela 19 Cherokee Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
16 /
Elvin, John G. 36 Perowne Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2AY / GB | |||
17 /
Duncan, Alexander R. 3 Hauwxton Road Little Shelford Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 5HJ / GB | |||
18 /
Derbyshire, Elaine J. 14 Towers Drive Crowthorne Berks Berkshire RG45 7LR / GB | |||
19 /
Carmen, Sara 136 Sturton Street Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 2QF / GB | |||
20 /
Smith, Stephen 33 Church Road Wicken Ely Cambridgeshire Cambridgeshire CB7 5XT / GB | |||
21 /
Holtet, Thor Las 13 Mortimer Road Royston Hertfordshire Hertfordshire / GB | |||
22 /
Du Fou, Sarah L. 76 Ickleford Road Hitchen Hertfordshire Hertfordshire SG5 1TL / GB | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/13] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09175437.4 | 24.03.2000 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | US19990126603P | 25.03.1999 Original published format: US 126603 P | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168984 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2168984 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, C12N15/13, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, C07K16/00, A61K39/395, G01N33/577, C12P21/08, A61P43/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP);
C07K16/24 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K16/244 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2317/21 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/13] | Extension states | RO | 02.09.2010 | SI | 02.09.2010 | Title | German: | Humane Antikörper die humanes IL-12 binden und Herstellungsverfahren | [2010/13] | English: | Human antibodies that bind human IL-12 and methods for producing | [2010/13] | French: | Anticorps humains qui se lient au IL-12 humain et procédé de fabrication | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 23.09.2010 | Observations by third parties | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2011 | Observations by third parties | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2012 | Observations by third parties | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2012 | Observations by third parties | 29.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2012 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00918396.3 / EP1175446 | Divisional application(s) | EP10180107.4 / EP2301970 | EP10180283.3 / EP2319870 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000918396) is 09.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.2013
19.01.2015
WITHDRAWN Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham PA 19044 / US Opponent's representative Wise, Daniel Joseph Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/09] |
Former [2013/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.2013
WITHDRAWN Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham PA 19044 / US Opponent's representative Wise, Daniel Joseph Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 08.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.10.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/47] | Appeal following opposition | 03.10.2014 | Appeal received No. T2019/14 | 22.09.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.08.2012 | LI | 29.08.2012 | [2016/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9404679 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-112 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 3 * * example 3 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0659766 (SCHERING PLOUGH CORP [FR]) [A] 1-112 * the whole document * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 33 * * claim - *; | [A]WO9524918 (GENETICS INST [US]) [A] 1-112 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9822137 (KENNEDY INST OF RHEUMATOLOGY [GB], et al) [A] 1-112 * the whole document *; | [I] - CARTER R ET AL, "Production and characterization of monoclonal antibodies to human interleukin-12", HYBRIDOMA, LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19970801), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 363 - 369, XP002099941 [I] 1-112 * the whole document * | [A] - PINI A ET AL, "Hierarchical affinity maturation of a phage library derived antibody for the selective removal of cytomegalovirus from plasma", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, (19970807), vol. 206, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 171 - 182, XP004093130 [A] 1-112 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00107-5 | [A] - IRVING R A ET AL, "Affinity maturation of recombinant antibodies using E.coli mutator cells", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, (19960601), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 127 - 143, XP004052677 [A] 1-112 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1380-2933(96)00044-9 | [A] - PINI A ET AL, "Design and use of a phage display library. Human antibodies with subnanomolar affinity against a marker of angiogenesis eluted from a two-dimensional gel", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM, US, (19980821), vol. 273, no. 34, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21769 - 21776, XP002124781 [A] 1-112 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.34.21769 | [A] - NERI D ET AL, "Targeting by affinity-matured recombinant antibody fragments of an angiogenesis associated fibronectin isoform", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19971101), vol. 15, no. 12, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1271 - 1275, XP002124779 [A] 1-112 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1197-1271 | Examination | WO9633735 | - DENG S J ET AL, "Basis for selection of improved carbohydrate-binding single-chain antibodies from synthetic gene libraries.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 23 MAY 1995 LNKD- PUBMED:7539139, (19950523), vol. 92, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4992 - 4996 | - RIECHMANN L AND WEILL M, "Phage display and selection of a site-directed randomized single-chain antibody Fv fragment for its affinity improvement", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19930831), vol. 32, no. 34, doi:10.1021/BI00085A016, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8848 - 8855, XP002147197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00085a016 | - KOSAKO HIDETAKA ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of neutralizing single-chain antibodies against Xenopus mitogen-activated protein kinase kinase from phage display libraries", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, no. 40, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 13212 - 13221 | - Aya Jakobovits, "Production of fully human antibodies by transgenic mice", Current Opinion in Biotechnology, (19950101), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0958-1669(95)80093-X, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 561 - 566, XP055000023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(95)80093-X | - NICHOLSON I C ET AL, "Antibody repertoires of four- and five-feature translocus mice carrying human immunoglobulin heavy chain and kappa and lambda light chain yeast artificial chromosomes", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19990101), vol. 163, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6898 - 6906, XP002974255 | - ROVAI LEONOR E ET AL, "The murine neutrophil-chemoattractant chemokines LIX, KC, and MIP-2 have distinct induction kinetics, tissue distributions, and tissue-specific sensitivities to glucocorticoid regulation in endotoxemia", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (199810), vol. 64, no. 4, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 494 - 502 | - MACCALLUM R M ET AL, "Antibody-antigen interactions: Contact analysis and binding site topography", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, (19960101), vol. 262, no. 5, doi:10.1006/JMBI.1996.0548, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 732 - 745, XP002242391 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1996.0548 | - I Tomlinson ET AL, "The Imprint of Somatic Hypermutation on the Repertoire of Human Germline V Genes", Journal of Molecular Biology, (19960315), vol. 256, no. 5, doi:10.1006/jmbi.1996.0127, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 813 - 817, XP055015377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1996.0127 | - PINI A ET AL, "Design and use of a phage display library. Human antibodies with subnanomolar affinity against a marker of angiogenesis eluted from a two-dimensional gel", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, (19980821), vol. 273, no. 34, doi:10.1074/JBC.273.34.21769, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21769 - 21776, XP002124781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.34.21769 | - MENDEZ MICHAEL J ET AL, "Functional transplant of megabase human immunoglobulin loci recapitulates human antibody responses in mice", NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 146 - 156 | - HOOGENBOOM H R, "Designing and optimizing library selection strategies for generating high-affinity antibodies", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19970201), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0167-7799(97)84205-9, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 62 - 70, XP004034115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(97)84205-9 | by applicant | US4399216 | US4510245 | US4634665 | US4816397 | US4968615 | WO9201047 | WO9209690 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | US5168062 | US5179017 | WO9301288 | US5464758 | WO9715327 | US5643768 | US5654168 | US5658754 | - KOBAYASHI, J. EXP MED., (1989), vol. 170, pages 827 - 845 | - SEDER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 90, pages 10188 - 10192 | - LING, J EXP MED., (1995), vol. 154, pages 116 - 127 | - PODLASKI ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1992), vol. 294, pages 230 - 237 | - GATELY ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 16, pages 495 - 521 | - WINDHAGEN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 182, pages 1985 - 1996 | - MORITA ET AL., ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 306 - 314 | - BUCHT ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 103, pages 347 - 367 | - FAIS ET AL., J. INTERFERON RES., (1994), vol. 14, pages 235 - 238 | - PARRONCHI ET AL., AM. J PATH., (1997), vol. 150, pages 823 - 832 | - MONTELEONE ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY., (1997), vol. 112, pages 1169 - 1178 | - BERREBI ET AL., AM. J PATH, (1998), vol. 152, pages 667 - 672 | - FUSS ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 157, pages 1261 - 1270 | - NEURATH ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 182, pages 1281 - 1290 | - DUCHMANN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 26, pages 934 - 938 | - JUNGHANS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, pages 1495 - 1502 | - BROWN, PROC. NALL. ACAD. SCI., (1991), vol. 88, pages 2663 - 2667 | - KETTLEBOROUGH ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING., (1991), vol. 4, pages 773 - 783 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJAK, R.J. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - KIPRIYANOV, S.M. ET AL., HUMAN ANTIBODIES AND HYBRIDOMAS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 93 - 101 | - KIPRIYANOV, S.M. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 31, pages 1047 - 1058 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., J EXP MED., (1989), vol. 170, pages 827 - 845 | - LING ET AL., J. EXP MED., (1995), vol. 154, pages 116 - 127 | - PODLASKI, ARCH. BIOCHEN7. BIOPHYS., (1992), vol. 294, pages 230 - 237 | - KABAT ET AL., ANN. NYACAD, SCI., (1971), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391 | - TAYLOR, L.D. ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295 | - JONSSON, U. ET AL., ANN. BIOL. CLIN., (1993), vol. 51, pages 19 - 26 | - J6NSSON, U. ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1991), vol. 11, pages 620 - 627 | - JOHNSSON, B., J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (1995), vol. 8, pages 125 - 131 | - JOHNNSON, B. ET AL., ANAL, BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 198, pages 268 - 277 | - FUCHS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 1372 | - HAY ET AL., HUM ANTIBOD HYBRIDOMAS, (1992), vol. 3, pages 81 - 85 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - GRIFFITHS ET AL., EMBO J, (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - HAWKINS ET AL., JMOL BIOL, (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - GRAM ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 3576 - 3580 | - GARRAD ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1373 - 1377 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., NUC ACID RES, (1991), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 4137 | - BARBAS ET AL., PNAS, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - COOK ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1995), vol. 16, pages 237 - 242 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 799 - 817 | - WINTER ET AL., ANNUAL REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 55 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 264, pages 220 - 232 | - KABAT ET AL., ANN. NY A CAD, SCI., (1971), vol. 190, pages 382 - 393 | - TOMLISON, J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 256, pages 813 - 817 | - SHARON, PNAS, (1990), vol. 87, pages 4814 - 7 | - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745 | - PINI ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 21769 - 21776 | - HANES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4937 - 4942 | - DALL ACQUA ET AL., CURR. OPIN. STRUC. BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 443 - 450 | - HE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 5132 - 5134 | - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Technology: Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185 | - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - R.J. KAUFMAN; P.A. SHARP, MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621 | - FAIS ET AL., J, INTERFERON RES., (1994), vol. 14, pages 235 - 238 | - MONTELEONE ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 112, pages 1169 - 1178 | - PARRONCHI ET AL., AIN. J. PATH., (1997), vol. 150, pages 823 - 832 | - MORITA ET AL., ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (1998), vol. 41, pages 306 - 314 | - PARRONCHI ET AL., AMER. J. PATHOL., (1997), vol. 150, pages 823 - 832 | - BERREBI ET AL., AMER. J PATHOL., (1998), vol. 152, pages 667 - 672 | - DRULOVIC ET AL., J. NEUROL. SCI., (1997), vol. 147, pages 145 - 150 | - BALASHOV ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1997), vol. 94, pages 599 - 603 | - HAMID ET AL., J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 1, pages 225 - 231 | - TURKA ET AL., MOL. MED., (1995), vol. 1, pages 690 - 699 | - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 4484 - 4490 | - D'ANDREA ET AL., J.EXP. MED, (1992), vol. 176, pages 1387 - 1398 | - VILLINGER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 3946 - 3954 | - BUETTNER ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1998), vol. 10, pages 241 - 248 | - MARUO ET AL., J LEUKOCYTE BIOL, (1997), vol. 61, pages 346 - 352 | - J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 1143 - 1153 | - BREE ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES. COMM., (1994), vol. 204, pages 1150 - 1157 | - SIMPSON ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 187, no. 8, pages 1225 - 34 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 6, pages 3143 - 9 | - WINDHAGEN, A. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 182, pages 1985 - 1996 | - BALASHOV, K.E., PROC. NATL. ACAD, SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 599 - 603 | - BALASHOV, K.E. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 599 - 603 | - NICOLETTI, F. ET AL., J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 87 - 90 | - CORMABELLA, M. ET AL., J CLIN. INVEST., (1998), vol. 102, pages 671 - 678 | - LEONARD, J.P. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 181, pages 281 - 386 | - BANERJEE, S. ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1998), vol. 41, page S33 | - SEGAL, B.M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1998), vol. 187, pages 537 - 546 | - URLAUB, G.; CHASIN, L.A., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | WO1996US01382 | US19960599226 | other | WO9633735 | - RICH R.L. ET AL, "A global benchmark study using affinity-based biosensors", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2009), vol. 386, pages 194 - 216, XP002517855 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.AB.2008.11.021 | - MACCALLUM R.M. ET AL, "Antibody-antigen interactions: Contact analysis and binding site topography", J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 745, XP002242391 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1996.0548 | - TOMLINSON I. M. ET AL, "The imprint of somatic hypermutation on the repertoire of human germline V genes", J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 256, no. 5, pages 813 - 817, XP055015377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1996.0127 | - PINI A. ET AL, "Design and use of a phage display library. Human antibodies with subnanomolar affinity against a marker of angiogenesis eluted from a two-dimensional gel", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, no. 34, pages 21769 - 21776, XP002124781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.34.21769 | - MENDEZ M.J. ET AL, "Functional transplant of megabase human immunoglobulin loci recapitulates human antibody response in mice", NAT. GENET., (1997), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 146 - 156, XP002067603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0297-146 | - HOOGENBOOM H.R., "Designing and optimizing library selection strategies for generating high-affinity antibodies", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 62 - 70, XP004034115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(97)84205-9 |