EP2322333 - Mixed plastic waste processing apparatus, method of producing a hybrid plastic material, and hybrid plastic material obtained by blending. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bami Intelligence S.A. Rue Géard 6 1204 Geneva / CH | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mot, Jacques c/o Bami Intelligence SA Bahnhofstrasse 28 6300 Zug / CH | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 09176013.2 | 16.11.2009 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322333 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B29B7/28 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
B29B17/00 (EP);
B29B17/0036 (EP);
B01F27/112 (EP);
B01F27/60 (EP);
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29C48/09 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Mischplastik-Abfallverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Herstellungsverfahren für ein hybrides Kunststoffmaterial und durch Mischen erreichtes hybrides Kunststoffmaterial | [2011/20] | English: | Mixed plastic waste processing apparatus, method of producing a hybrid plastic material, and hybrid plastic material obtained by blending. | [2011/20] | French: | Appareil de traitement de déchets plastiques mélangés, procédé de fabrication d'un matériau plastique hybride, matériau plastique hybride obtenu par mélange | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1637216 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 7 * abstract * [I] 10-13; | [XDI]US6107400 (MARIANI CINZIA LICIA [IT], et al) [XD] 7 * column 2, line 21 - column 2, line 33; figures 1-5 * [I] 10-13; | [XI]WO9534418 (R H WRIDE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 7 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 9; figure 1 * [I] 10-13; | [X]DE19916895 (WEICHENRIEDER HERMA [DE]) [X] 13 * abstract *; | [A]US3447201 (SEANOR REX C, et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1-5 * | by applicant | US6107400 |