18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
25.01.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
12.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
17.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
23.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.12.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.07.2010 |
First examination report |
|
15.07.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
29.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |