Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8827926 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2014 | B2 | US2009182246 | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2476608 | 30.01.2008 | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | US620207 | 31.12.2007 | US34392808 | 24.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5354916B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2013 | B2 | JP2009172251 | 06.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5430065B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B2 | JP2009160121 | 23.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2158933 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2012 | B1 | EP2158933 | 03.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | EP08172416 | 19.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2075030 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2010 | B1 | EP2075030 | 01.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE469668T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE550065T | 15.04.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602008001430D1 | 15.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2379911T | 04.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2007340858 | 28.12.2007 | JP2008015575 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Earlier application | EP2075030 |