EP2120175 - Identity verification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burden, Robert W.W. 1875 Bellevue Avenue Suite 406 West Vancouver BC / CA | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09251319.1 | 14.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | GB20080008752 | 14.05.2008 Original published format: GB 0808752 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120175 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2120175 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/20 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3227 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L9/3226 (EP,US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2103 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Identitätsverifizierung | [2009/47] | English: | Identity verification | [2009/47] | French: | Vérification d'identité | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9600485 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 3 * * claims 1-5 * * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 30 *; | [I]US2003055738 (ALIE CLAUDE [CA]) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0099] *; | [I]WO2006075917 (LINDMO ERIK [NO], et al) [I] 1-18 * figure 7 ** page 16, line 10 - page 18, line 11 * |