01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
03.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
12.03.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
13.01.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.11.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
18.04.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.04.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |