22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
06.06.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
28.06.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
21.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
20.11.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |