Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2135535 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B1 | EP2135535 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0803454 | 20.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2932669 | 13.08.2010 | B1 | FR2932669 | 25.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0803454 | 20.06.2008 |