EP2135535 - Appliance for preparing a foam from a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seb S.A. Les 4M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [2013/31] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Seb SA Les 4M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuy, Christian 1, Allée des papillons 53440 La Bazoge Montpincon / FR | 02 /
Evrard, Yoann 10, Rue de Lisbonne 53950 Louverne / FR | 03 /
Desmeulles, Christophe 31, Rue des Cigognes 50000 Saint-Lô / FR | 04 /
Deliens, Patrick 7, Avenue Hoche 53100 Mayenne / FR | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09356041.5 | 12.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | FR20080003454 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803454 | [2009/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135535 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2135535 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/08, A47J43/046, A47J31/00, A47J36/26 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A47J43/085 (EP);
A47J27/004 (EP);
A47J31/00 (EP);
A47J36/26 (EP);
A47J43/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Zubereitung von Schaum aus einer Flüssigkeit | [2009/52] | English: | Appliance for preparing a foam from a liquid | [2009/52] | French: | Appareil pour la préparation de mousse à partir d'un liquide | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2009 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MK | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | NO | 31.10.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 31.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1141072 (AUVRAY, M.-A. [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, column 2, line 10 - page 2, column 1, line 10; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP1656866 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [DA] 1-8 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031]; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | EP1656866 |