EP2236804 - Gas mixing device particularly for internal-combustion engines equipped with exhaust gas recirculation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FPT Industrial S.p.A. Via Puglia 15 10156 Torino / IT | [2012/08] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Fiat Powertrain Technologies S.p.A. Via Puglia 15 10156 Torino (TO) / IT | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Iveco S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10156 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cereda, Giuseppe Via Volvera 10 10141 Torino / IT | 02 /
Vietti, Graziano Via Repubblica 5 10075 Mathi Canavese / IT | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425125.3 | 31.03.2009 | [2010/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236804 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2236804 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
F02M26/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | Gasmischvorrichtung, insbesondere für Verbrennungsmotoren, die mit einem Abgasrückführsystem ausgerüstet sind | [2010/40] | English: | Gas mixing device particularly for internal-combustion engines equipped with exhaust gas recirculation system | [2010/40] | French: | Dispositif de mélange de gaz en particulier pour les moteurs à combustion interne équipés d'un système de recirculation des gaz d'échappement | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2009 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | IE | 31.03.2013 | LU | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 31.03.2009 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
LU | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4319380 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 47 - column 2, line 68; figures 2,4,5 * [Y] 2-6; | [X]JP2006242172 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH0561445U (PATENTEE NOT KNOWN) [Y] 2-5 * figure 5 *; | [Y]DE4420247 (IAV MOTOR GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0857870 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 10; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | DE4319380 |