17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
31.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
22.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
31.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
16.05.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
31.12.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.11.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.07.2011 |
First examination report |
|
20.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
03.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.04.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.03.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
10.09.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] |