EP2239580 - Determination of 5-ASA efficacy in CRC prevention and/or treatment by gene expression analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LGA BIOTECNOLOGIE SRL Via Firenze 40 20060 Trezzano Rosa (MI) / IT | [2012/07] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Sofar SPA Via Firenze 40 20060 Trezzano Rosa (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Sofar SPA Viale Isonzo, 8 20135 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grande, Alexis Via dei Glicini, 61/4 41100 Modena / IT | 02 /
Parenti, Sandra Via Firenze, 198 41100 Modena / IT | 03 /
Ferrarini, Fabrizio Via Ventimiglia, 121 41100 Modena / IT | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2013/13] |
Former [2010/41] | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Marina 6 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425136.0 | 09.04.2009 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239580 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2239580 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/57419 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2333/705 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | 11.04.2011 | BA | 11.04.2011 | RS | 11.04.2011 | Title | German: | Bestimmung von 5-ASA-Wirksamkeit bei der Verhinderung und/oder Behandlung von kolorektalem Krebs durch Genexpressionsanalyse | [2010/41] | English: | Determination of 5-ASA efficacy in CRC prevention and/or treatment by gene expression analysis | [2010/41] | French: | Détermination de l'efficacité du 5-ASA pour la prévention et/ou le traitement du CRC par l'analyse de l'expression génique | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 25.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2009 | AT | 27.03.2013 | BE | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MK | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | IE | 09.04.2013 | LU | 09.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MK | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
MT | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
BE | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 27.03.2013 | |
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | NO | 27.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - BOS CARINA L ET AL, "Protein phosphatase 2A is required for mesalazine-dependent inhibition of Wnt/beta-catenin pathway activity.", CARCINOGENESIS DEC 2006, (200612), vol. 27, no. 12, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 2371 - 2382, XP002539164 [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 2372, cell culture paragraph * [A] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/CARCIN/BG1071 | [A] - RUBIN DAVID T ET AL, "Colorectal cancer prevention in inflammatory bowel disease and the role of 5-aminosalicylic acid: a clinical review and update.", INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES FEB 2008, (200802), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 1078-0998, pages 265 - 274, XP002539165 [A] 1-8 * page 271, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ibd.20297 | [A] - STOLFI CARMINE ET AL, "Molecular basis of the potential of mesalazine to prevent colorectal cancer.", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY : WJG 28 JUL 2008, (20080728), vol. 14, no. 28, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 4434 - 4439, XP002539166 [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * page 4436, column R, paragraph 2 - page 4437, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3748/WJG.14.4434 | [A] - GOLDBERG M ET AL, "mu.-protocadherin, a novel developmentally regulated protocadherin with mucin-like domains", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM, US, (20000811), vol. 275, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 24622 - 24629, XP002974003 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M000234200 | by applicant | - JANNE PA; MAYER RJ., "Chemoprevention of colorectal cancer", N ENGL J MED, (2000), vol. 342, pages 1960 - 8 | - SANDLER RS ET AL., "A randomized trial of aspirin to prevent colorectal adenomas in patients with previous colorectal cancer.", N ENGL J MED, (2003), vol. 348, pages 883 - 90 | - STOLFI C ET AL., "Molecular basis of the potential of mesalazine to prevent colorectal cancer.", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2008), vol. 14, pages 4434 - 9 | - CHENG Y; DESREUMAUX P., "5-aminosalicylic acid is an attractive candidate agent for chemoprevention of colon cancer in patients with inflammatory bowel disease.", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2005), vol. 11, pages 309 - 14 | - ALLGAYER H., "Review article: mechanisms of action of mesalazine in preventing colorectal carcinoma in inflammatory bowel disease.", ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER, (2003), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 10 - 4 | - ROUSSEAUX C ET AL., "Intestinal antiinflammatory effect of 5- aminosalicylic acid is dependent on peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor- gamma.", J EXP MED, (2005), vol. 201, pages 1205 - 15 | - REINACHER-SCHICK A ET AL., "Mesalazine causes a mitotic arrest and induces caspase-dependent apoptosis in colon carcinoma cells.", CARCINOGENESIS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 443 - 51 | - GASCHE C ET AL., "Mesalazine improves replication fidelity in cultured colorectal cells.", CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 65, pages 3993 - 7 | - CHU EC ET AL., "Mesalazine downregulates c-Myc in human colon cancer cells. A key to its chemopreventive action?", ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER, (2007), vol. 25, pages 1443 - 9 | - LUCIANI MG ET AL., "5-ASA affects cell cycle progression in colorectal cells by reversibly activating a replication checkpoint.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2007), vol. 132, pages 221 - 35 | - BOS CL ET AL., "Protein phosphatase 2A is required for mesalazine-dependent inhibition of Wnt/beta-catenin pathway activity.", CARCINOGENESIS, (2006), vol. 27, pages 2371 - 82 | - VAN DE WETERING M ET AL., "The beta- catenin/TCF-4 complex imposes a crypt progenitor phenotype on colorectal cancer cells.", CELL, (2002), vol. 111, pages 241 - 50 | - FEVR T ET AL., "Wnt/beta-catenin is essential for intestinal homeostasis and maintenance of intestinal stem cells.", MOL CELL BIOL, (2007), vol. 27, pages 7551 - 9 | - OLMEDA D ET AL., "Beta-catenin regulation during the cell cycle: implications in G2/M and apoptosis.", MOL BIOL CELL, (2003), vol. 14, pages 2844 - 60 | - AOKI K ET AL., "Chromosomal instability by beta-cateninlTCF transcription in APC or beta-catenin mutant cells.", ONCOGENE, (2007), vol. 26, pages 3511 - 20 | - PALMER HG ET AL., "Vitamin D(3) promotes the differentiation of colon carcinoma cells by the induction of E-cadherin and the inhibition of beta-catenin signaling.", J CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 154, pages 369 - 87 | - HOU R ET AL., "The Fat1 cadherin integrates vascular smooth muscle cell growth and migration signals.", J CELL BIOL, (2006), vol. 173, pages 417 - 29 | - EVANS PM; LIU C., "Roles of Krüpel-like factor 4 in normal homeostasis, cancer and stem cells", ACTA BIOCHIM BIOPHYS SIN (SHANGHAI), (200807), vol. 40, no. 7, pages 554 - 64 | - ZHANG W ET AL., "Novel cross talk of Kruppel-like factor 4 and beta-catenin regulates normal intestinal homeostasis and tumor repression.", MOL CELL BIOL., (200603), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 2055 - 64 | - SCHUSTER MB; PORSE BT., "C/EBPalpha: a tumour suppressor in multiple tissues?", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (200608), vol. 1766, no. 1, pages 88 - 103 |