EP2247769 - SOLID PRECURSOR SUBLIMATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Mindi 1082 Challdon Court Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
CHAUBEY, Trapti 2503 Braken Avenue Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | [2011/39] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
XU, Mindi 1082 Challdon Court Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | ||
02 /
CHAUBEY, Trapti 1431 Kynlyn Dr. Wilmington Delaware 19809 / US | Representative(s) | Grout de Beaufort, François-Xavier L'Air Liquide SA 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2011/39] |
Former [2010/45] | Grout de Beaufort, François-Xavier L'Air Liquide SA 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09700894.0 | 12.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009IB50112 | Priority number, date | US20080020339 | 10.01.2008 Original published format: US 20339 | US20080093960 | 03.09.2008 Original published format: US 93960 | US20090351723 | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 351723 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009087609 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2247769 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247769 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/448 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
C23C16/4481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | SUBLIMATOR FÜR FESTE VORSTUFE | [2010/45] | English: | SOLID PRECURSOR SUBLIMATOR | [2010/45] | French: | SUBLIMATEUR À PRÉCURSEUR SOLIDE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2009 | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HR | 28.09.2011 | IT | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MK | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | NO | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | ES | 08.01.2012 | IE | 12.01.2012 | LU | 12.01.2012 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
LU | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3003249 (SPENCER TEMPLETON ROBERT ALEXA) [A] 1-27* figure 8 *; | [A]US6270839 (ONOE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * figures 5,9 *; | [A]US2005072357 (SHERO ERIC J [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0098] - [0102]; figures 13-18 * |