EP2253042 - AN INTELLIGENT FAULT-TOLERANT BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atieva, Inc. 579 Clyde Avenue, Suite 320 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENG, Sam 1100 island DriveSuite 103 Redwood City CA94065 / US | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
WENG, Sam 579 Clyde Ave. Suite 320 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | MacKenzie, Ian Alastair Robert, et al IP Europe Ltd. 1504 Lemonade Building 3 Arboretum Place London IG11 7PY / GB | ||
Former [2010/47] | MacKenzie, Ian Alastair Robert, et al European IP Ltd 189 Bow Road London, E3 2SJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09711295.7 | 17.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009US34332 | Priority number, date | US20080029300 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: US 29300 | US20080029302 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: US 29302 | US20080029296 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: US 29296 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009103086 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2253042 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, G01R31/36, H02J7/00 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
G01R31/396 (EP,US);
H02J7/0014 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | H01M10/48, G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES FEHLERTOLERANTES BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/47] | English: | AN INTELLIGENT FAULT-TOLERANT BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2010/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIES INTELLIGENT ET À TOLÉRANCE DE PANNES | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 06.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0161822 (LIEBERT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005084745 (COLELLO GARY M [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [Y]US2007282459 (SCHAFER PARTRICK [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5610495 (YEE RENWIN J [US], et al); | [A]US2002136042 (LAYDEN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2005077878 (CARRIER DAVE [US], et al); | [A]JP2005318750 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) |