EP2249227 - INTERFACE DEVICE FOR HOST DEVICE, INTERFACE DEVICE FOR SLAVE DEVICE, HOST DEVICE, SLAVE DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND INTERACE VOLTAGE SWITCHING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYAMA, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHARU, Yoshida c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/22] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
TOYAMA, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHARU, Yoshida c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAI, Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2015/22] |
Former [2010/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09713710.3 | 27.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009JP00908 | Priority number, date | JP20080049360 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008049360 | [2010/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009107400 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249227 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249227 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G06F1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HOST-VORRICHTUNG, SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SLAVE-VORRICHTUNG, HOST-VORRICHTUNG, SLAVE-VORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND SCHNITTSTELLENSPANNUNGS-SCHALTVERFAHREN | [2010/45] | English: | INTERFACE DEVICE FOR HOST DEVICE, INTERFACE DEVICE FOR SLAVE DEVICE, HOST DEVICE, SLAVE DEVICE, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND INTERACE VOLTAGE SWITCHING METHOD | [2010/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE POUR DISPOSITIF HÔTE, DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE POUR DISPOSITIF ESCLAVE, DISPOSITIF HÔTE, DISPOSITIF ESCLAVE, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE TENSION D'INTERFACE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2010 | Translation filed | 05.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 10.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2009 | AT | 27.05.2015 | BE | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | IE | 27.02.2016 | LU | 27.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 27.02.2009 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.02.2009 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2003514296 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.); | [A]WO2006117966 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002169631 |