EP2252398 - GEOMETRICALLY SIZED SOLID SHAPED CARRIER FOR OLEFIN EPOXIDATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SD Lizenzverwertungsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG A Company of Germany Lenbachplatz 6 80333 Munchen / DE | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAK, Serguei 46 Fycke Lane Teaneck New Jersey 07666 / US | 02 /
ROKICKI, Andrzej 3 Bridle Court Mountain Lakes New Jersey 07046 / US | 03 /
SACHS, Howard 3840 Greystone Avenue Bronx New York 10463 / US | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Westendorp, Michael Oliver Westendorp I Sommer Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719060.7 | 06.03.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009US36307 | Priority number, date | US20080045251 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: US 45251 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009114411 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2252398 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J35/02, B01J32/00, B01J21/04, B01J21/06, B01J21/10, B01J23/50, B01J23/16 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
C07D301/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/56 (KR);
B01J21/04 (KR);
B01J23/50 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/66 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/683 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/688 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/612 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | GEOMETRISCH GEFORMTER FESTER TRÄGER FÜR EINEN OLEFINEPOXIDIERUNGSKATALYSATOR | [2010/47] | English: | GEOMETRICALLY SIZED SOLID SHAPED CARRIER FOR OLEFIN EPOXIDATION CATALYST | [2010/47] | French: | SUPPORT SOLIDE GÉOMÉTRIQUE POUR CATALYSEUR D ÉPOXYDATION OLÉFINIQUE | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 21.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 04.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6083870 (KAHN ANDREW P [US], et al); | [XY]US6413898 (FABER MARGARET K [US], et al); | [A]WO2005075075 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]EP1847320 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]EP0229465 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [X]EP0218766 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [A]US6667271 (BARTHOLDY JESPER [DK]); | [A]US6780817 (KOYAMA HIROKI [JP], et al) | Examination | US4366093 | by applicant | US2950169 | US3172866 | US3222129 | US3563914 | US3702259 | US4226782 | US4242235 | US4761394 | US4766105 | US4908343 | US5011807 | US5057481 | US5099041 | US5102848 | US5112795 | US5187140 | US5266548 | US5380697 | US5407888 | US5597773 | US5831037 | US2004110973 | US2004225138 | US6831037 | US2004260103 | US2005096219 | US2006252643 | other | US4761394 | US4766105 | US4837194 | US5407888 | EP0218766 | US2006065064 |