EP2276769 - NEW PEPTIDOMIMETIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Almqvist, Fredrik Timmermansgatan 17 90420 Umeå / SE | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELLSTEDT, Magnus Strombergs väg 128 Lgh 107 907 28 Umeå / SE | 02 /
DAS, Pralay c/o Pasupati Das Banshbari Malda West Bengal PIN NO-732101 / IN | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
SELLSTEDT, Magnus Strombergs väg 128 907 28 Umeå / SE | ||
02 /
DAS, Pralay c/o Pasupati Das Banshbari Malda West Bengal PIN NO-732101 / IN | |||
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
SELLSTEDT, Magnus Pingstvägen 52 S-12636 Hägersten / SE | ||
02 /
DAS, Pralay c/o Pasupati Das Banshbari Malda West Bengal PIN NO-732101 / IN | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Linde, Jörgen, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Linde, Jörgen Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09739084.3 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009SE50464 | Priority number, date | US20080048976P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 48976 P | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/04] | US20080048976 | 30.04.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009134203 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276769 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/14, A61K31/549, A61P11/00, A61P25/28, A61P31/04, A61P9/00, A61K31/437, C07D471/04 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D513/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | NEUE PEPTIDOMIMETISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2011/04] | English: | NEW PEPTIDOMIMETIC COMPOUNDS | [2011/04] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS PEPTIDOMIMÉTIQUES | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 01.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO9612720 (PFIZER [US], et al); | [A]FR1463883 (CIBA GEIGY); | [A]WO0136426 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [A]US2004214838 (CARPINO PHILIP A [US], et al); | [A]US2007082887 (HULTGREN SCOTT J [US], et al); | [A] - CHORELL E. ET AL., "Diverse functionalization of thiazolo ring-fused 2-pyridones", J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 4917 - 4924, XP003026966 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO0704053 | [A] - DOW R. L. ET AL, "Discovery of 2-(2-Chlorophenyl)-3-(4-chlorophenyl)-7-(2,2-difluoropropyl)-6,7-dihydro-2H-pyrazolo[3,4-f][1,4]oxazepin-8-(5H)-one(PF-514273), a Novel, Bicyclic Lactam-Based Cannabinoid-1 Receptor Antagonist for the Treatment of Obesity", J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, pages 2652 - 2655, XP003026967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM900255T | [A] - MAGGIO B. ET AL, "Nonclassical Pschorr and Sandmeyer Reactions in Pyrazole Series", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2005), vol. 88, pages 2272 - 2281, XP002526457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.200590161 | [A] - ZHANG X. ET AL, "Design and synthesis of 6-amino-5-oxo-1,2,3,5-tetrahydro-3-indolizinecarboxylic acids as beta-sheet peptidomimetics", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2002), vol. 43, pages 9663 - 9666, XP004395758 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)02447-4 | [A] - PAULETTI G. M., "Improvement of oral peptide bioavailability: Peptidomimetics and prodrug strategies", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1997), vol. 27, pages 235 - 256, XP002234351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(97)00045-8 | [XP] - SELLSTEDT M. ET AL., "Synthesis of a novel tricyclic peptidomimetic scaffold", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2008), vol. 10, no. 18, pages 4005 - 4007, XP003026968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol801506y | [XP] - REGISTRY, (20090301), Database accession no. 1113114-83-2, XP003026969 | [ ] - REGISTRY, (20090301), Database accession no. 1113114-71-8, XP003026970 | [ ] - REGISTRY, (20090226), Database accession no. 1112360-96-9, XP003026971 | [ ] - REGISTRY, (20090226), Database accession no. 1112327-64-6, XP003026972 | [ ] - REGISTRY, (20090224), Database accession no. 1111156-46-7, XP003026973 | [ ] - REGISTRY, (20090224), Database accession no. 1111022-42-4, XP003026974 | [ ] - REGISTRY, (20090224), Database accession no. 1111022-38-8, XP003026975 | by applicant | WO0136426 | JP2005320346 | WO2005030716 | WO0174793 | - ASKANAS, ANN. NEUROL, (1993), vol. 43, pages 521 - 560 | - LEWY, Handbuch der Neurologie, SPRINGER, (1912), pages 920 - 933 | - WAKABAYASHI, ACTA NEUROPATH, (1998), vol. 96, pages 445 - 452 | - BENSON; COHEN, ARTH. RHEUM., (1979), vol. 22, pages 36 - 42 | - HARADA, J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1971), vol. 19, pages 1 - 15 | - JOHNSON, N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, pages 513 - 518 | - LAB. INVEST., (1992), vol. 66, pages 522 - 535 | - GEYJO, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1985), vol. 129, pages 701 - 706 | - SKINNER; COHEN, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1981), vol. 99, pages 1326 - 1332 | - MULVEY, CELLULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 4, pages 257 - 271 | - LEE, CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2003), vol. 3, pages 513 - 519 | - KRISHNAMURTI, BLOOD, (1987), vol. 69, page 798 | - ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND THROMBOSIS, (1991), vol. 11, page 1276 | - CARMELIET, JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1993), vol. 92, page 2756 | - ROCHA, FIBRINOLYSIS, (1994), vol. 8, page 294 | - AZNAR, HAEMOSTASIS, (1994), vol. 24, page 243 | - ABRAHAMSSON, THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1996), vol. 75, page 118 | - NORDT, JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (2000), vol. 85, no. 4, page 1563 | - DACI, JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 15, no. 8, page 1510 | - ALMQVIST ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 4917 - 4924 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, no. 20, pages 6756 - 6761 |