EP2359084 - DRIVE AND QUICK STOP FOR A WEAPON WITH PREFERABLY LINEAR BREECH OR AMMUNITION FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRMANN, Ralf-Joachim Finkenstrasse 1a 15754 Senzig / DE | 02 /
LAWITZKE, Klaus Breitscheidstrasse 17 39114 Magdeburg / DE | 03 /
SCHMEES, Heiner Kreuzgarten 44 29223 Celle / DE | 04 /
BAUMANN, Berthold Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
HERRMANN, Ralf-Joachim Finkenstrasse 1a 15754 Senzig / DE | ||
02 /
LAWITZKE, Klaus Breitscheidstrasse 17 39114 Magdeburg / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMEES, Heiner Kreuzgarten 44 29223 Celle / DE | |||
04 /
BAUMANN, Berthold Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09752121.5 | 07.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009EP07976 | Priority number, date | DE20081060215 | 04.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008060215 | [2011/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010063356 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359084 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2359084 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41A7/08, F41A17/18 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
F41A7/08 (EP,KR,US);
F41A17/18 (EP,KR,US);
F41A9/38 (KR);
F41A9/50 (EP,KR,US);
F41A9/51 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEB UND SCHNELLSTOPP FÜR EINE WAFFE MIT VORZUGSWEISE LINEARER VERSCHLUSS- BZW. MUNITIONSZUFÜHRUNG | [2011/34] | English: | DRIVE AND QUICK STOP FOR A WEAPON WITH PREFERABLY LINEAR BREECH OR AMMUNITION FEED | [2011/34] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'ARRÊT INSTANTANÉ POUR ARME DE PRÉFÉRENCE AVEC AMENÉE LINÉAIRE DE LA CULASSE OU DE LA MUNITION | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 24.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2009 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | ES | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MK | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | SM | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | AT | 07.11.2014 | IE | 07.11.2014 | LU | 07.11.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.11.2009 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 07.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.11.2009 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 07.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 07.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 07.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 07.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 07.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.11.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3021200 (SUMMA CORP) [AD] 1-8 * page 21, paragraph 3 - page 24, paragraph 1; figures 2,4-7 *; | [A]DE3216813 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure 5 *; | [A]JPH07139896 (JAPAN TECH RES & DEV INST, et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003]; figures 11,12 *; | [A]JPH07174491 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009]; figures 1-9 * |