EP2281326 - POLARIZATION INSENSITIVE ANTENNA FOR HANDHELD RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION READERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Motorola Plaza, MS A6 Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLOWS, David 2541 Mermaid Avenue Wantagh NY 11793 / US | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/06] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09755634.4 | 19.05.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009US44463 | Priority number, date | US20080129363 | 29.05.2008 Original published format: US 129363 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009146272 | Date: | 03.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2281326 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2281326 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/10, H01Q21/24, H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01Q13/16 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2216 (EP,US);
H01Q13/16 (EP,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/06] | H01Q13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | POLARISATIONSUNEMPFINDLICHE ANTENNE FÜR TRAGBARE RFID-LESEGERÄTE | [2011/06] | English: | POLARIZATION INSENSITIVE ANTENNA FOR HANDHELD RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION READERS | [2011/06] | French: | ANTENNE INSENSIBLE À LA POLARISATION POUR DES LECTEURS À IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIOFRÉQUENCE MANUELS | [2011/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 06.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2009 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BE | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | ES | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | IT | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MK | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IE | 19.05.2014 | LU | 19.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.05.2009 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.05.2009 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2003069463 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [X] 1-8,15-20 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1,3,5,6 * [Y] 9-14; | [X]US2004090372 (NALLO CARLO DI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 5-11 *; | [X]US2005176390 (NAVSARIWALA UMESH D [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] ** figure 1 *; | [X]US2005264455 (TALVITIE OLLI [FI], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2008042846 (JENKINS ALAN PETER [US], et al) [Y] 9-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 6, 8 * | International search | [A]US3328800 (ALGEO JERRY A); | [X]US6501435 (KING PATRICK F [US], et al); | [Y]US6750771 (BRAND TIMOTHY K [US]) | by applicant | JP2003069463 | US2008042846 |