|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Subsequently filed documents not duly signed |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.04.2010 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
13 |