08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
03.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
14.06.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
07.06.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
19.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
19.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.06.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2015 |
First examination report |
|
17.04.2015 |
Change - inventor |
|
17.04.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
11.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
13.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
18.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
21.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|