Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9587887 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2017 | B2 | US2011139418 | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009AT00201 | 15.05.2009 | AT8912008 | 03.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2297539 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2019 | B1 | EP2297539 | 23.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009AT00201 | 15.05.2009 | AT8912008 | 03.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102066867B | 02.01.2013 | B | CN102066867 | 18.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009AT00201 | 15.05.2009 | AT8912008 | 03.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009146474 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2010 | A3 | WO2009146474 | 10.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AT8912008 | 03.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT506309B | 15.08.2009 | B1 | AT506309 | 15.08.2009 | A4 | Priority number | Date | AT8912008 | 03.06.2008 |