EP2286356 - APPLIANCE DEVELOPMENT TOOLKIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 N. M 63 Benton Harbor, 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 N. M 63 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARGUE, Paul, R. 703 Polis Street Buchanan MI 49107 / US | 02 /
EBROM, Matthew, P. 384 Wildwood Drive Holland MI 49423 / US | 03 /
GLOTZBACH, Patrick, J. 4447 Rachel Lane St. Joseph MI 49085 / US | 04 /
MCCOY, Richard, A. 5013 Notre Dame Stevensville MI 49127 / US | 05 /
RADFORD, Brian, N. 2454 Jacob Trl Stevensville MI 49127-8737 / US | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
ARGUE, Paul, R. 703 Polis Street Buchanan MI 49107 / US | ||
02 /
EBROM, Matthew, P. 384 Wildwood Drive Holland MI 49423 / US | |||
03 /
GLOTZBACH, Patrick, J. 4447 Rachel Lane St. Joseph MI 49085 / US | |||
04 /
MCCOY, Richard, A. 5013 Notre Dame Stevensville MI 49127 / US | |||
05 /
RADFORD, Brian, N. 2720 Woodgate 258 St. Joseph MI 49085 / US | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09759378.4 | 03.06.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009US46186 | Priority number, date | US20080058440P | 03.06.2008 Original published format: US 58440 P | [2017/35] |
Former [2011/08] | US20080058440 | 03.06.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009149219 | Date: | 10.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286356 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/28, G06F9/44, G06F11/263 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H04L12/2814 (EP,US);
G06F11/263 (EP,US);
G06F8/10 (EP,US);
G06F8/36 (EP,US);
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | G06F17/50, G06F17/40, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | GERÄTEENTWICKLUNGS-TOOLKIT | [2011/08] | English: | APPLIANCE DEVELOPMENT TOOLKIT | [2011/08] | French: | BOÎTE À OUTILS DE DÉVELOPPEMENT D'APPAREIL | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 04.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 21.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | EP17181180.5 / EP3249893 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006020910 (SCHLANGER STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0055] *; | [X]US2006235548 (GAUDETTE THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0069] ** paragraph [0055] * | International search | [A]US2006168236 (HIGUMA TOSHIYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US2008109093 (MAEDA YASUTAKA [JP], et al); | [X]US2008125911 (EBROM MATTHEW P [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006020910 | US2006235548 |