Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
30.07.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.06.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.10.2013 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
04.10.2013 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
14.06.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.08.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
17.06.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.03.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
18.03.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
15.03.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.02.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.01.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.01.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |