Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009301687 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48174509 | 10.06.2009 | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009301541 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48174109 | 10.06.2009 | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8614390 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2013 | B2 | US2009301539 | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48175009 | 10.06.2009 | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2397790 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2014 | A3 | EP2397790 | 21.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | EP09763508 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2310762 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | A4 | EP2310762 | 20.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | WO2009US46860 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0915029 | 25.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | WO2009US46860 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102112821 | 29.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | WO2009US46860 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009152218 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923671 | 30.07.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102881816 | 16.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US6037708 | 10.06.2008 | Type | Divisional application | EP2397790 |